Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 544 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | File Number 463 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | House Calendar Number 271 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |