House | 03/13/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |