House | 04/30/2014 | File Number 717 | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 518 | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4426 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | File Number 464 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | House Calendar Number 272 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |