House | 05/12/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Public Act 14-14 | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 342 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | File Number 199 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | House Calendar Number 127 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/11/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |