House | 06/06/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Public Act 14-136 | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 341 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | File Number 335 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | House Calendar Number 197 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/14/2014 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |