LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2014 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05129
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05129
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2014 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05129
Action History
House
03/05/2014
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
House
03/05/2014
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
House
03/04/2014
Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
House
02/21/2014
Public Hearing 02/25
House
02/18/2014
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
House
02/13/2014
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement