House
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Special Act 14-14
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 453
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 437
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
House Calendar Number 251
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|