House | 04/24/2014 | File Number 669 | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | File Number 42 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 39 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/14/2014 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |