House | 04/15/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | File Number 336 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | House Calendar Number 198 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |