House
|
04/25/2014
|
File Number 683
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 463
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3769
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
File Number 527
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
House Calendar Number 334
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|