Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Public Act 14-133
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
File Number 738
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 548
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4771
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 438
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
House Calendar Number 252
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|