House
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Public Act 14-36
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 335
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
File Number 337
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
House Calendar Number 199
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|