House
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Public Act 14-137
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
File Number 677
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 446
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3545
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
File Number 79
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
House Calendar Number 57
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|