House | 04/17/2014 | File Number 600 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | House Calendar Number 392 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/18/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |