House | 05/28/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Public Act 14-67 | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 524 | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | File Number 547 | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | House Calendar Number 358 | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/18/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |