House | 04/04/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | File Number 137 | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | House Calendar Number 86 | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/19/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |