House
|
04/28/2014
|
File Number 697
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 503
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4366
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4251
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
File Number 402
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
House Calendar Number 236
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|