House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |