House
|
05/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2014
|
Public Act 14-56
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
File Number 684
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 464
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4083
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
File Number 623
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
House Calendar Number 393
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|