Senate
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Public Act 14-141
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
File Number 731
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 539
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4673
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
File Number 90
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
House Calendar Number 68
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|