House | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Public Hearing 02/25 | ||
House | 02/20/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |