Connecticut 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05298 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5298
22 February Session, 2014 LCO No. 1358
3- *_____HB05298VA_APP031214____*
3+ *01358_______VA_*
44 Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
55 Introduced by:
66 (VA)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 5298
1111
1212 February Session, 2014
1313
1414 LCO No. 1358
1515
16-*_____HB05298VA_APP031214____*
16+*01358_______VA_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (VA)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING ACTIVE SERVICE PAY FOR MEMBERS OF THE CONNECTICUT NATIONAL GUARD.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Section 27-61a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2014):
2929
3030 (a) As used in this section, "eligible member or veteran" means a member or former member of the Connecticut National Guard who (1) is or was called to active service on or after September 11, 2001, (2) is or was in such active service for at least ninety consecutive days, and (3) if discharged, is or was honorably discharged or discharged for injuries sustained in the line of duty.
3131
3232 (b) (1) On and after July 1, 2005, and prior to July 1, 2014, the Adjutant General shall pay each eligible member or veteran the amount of fifty dollars for each month or major part thereof of active service by such eligible member or veteran on or after September 11, 2001. On and before June 30, 2007, the maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran shall not exceed five hundred dollars.
3333
3434 (2) On and after July 1, 2007, and prior to July 1, 2014, the maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran under this subsection shall not exceed five hundred dollars, except that such maximum payment shall not exceed one thousand two hundred dollars if, during such active service, such eligible member or veteran is or was deployed to an area designated as a combat zone by the President of the United States.
3535
3636 (3) On and after July 1, 2014, the Adjutant General shall pay each eligible member or veteran the amount of one hundred dollars for each month or major part thereof of active service by such eligible member or veteran. The maximum payment to any eligible member or veteran under this subdivision shall not exceed one thousand dollars, except that such maximum payment shall not exceed one thousand four hundred dollars if, during such active service, such eligible member or veteran is or was deployed to an area designated as a combat zone by the President of the United States.
3737
3838 [(3)] (4) No payment shall be made under this subsection to any eligible member or veteran who makes application for such payment later than three years after the date of the cessation of such [operations in which such member or veteran served] active service.
3939
4040 (c) The Adjutant General, in consultation with the Commissioner of Veterans' Affairs, shall adopt regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54, to implement the provisions of this section. Such regulations shall include procedures for verification of eligibility of an eligible member or veteran and for the application for and payment of the amounts specified in this section.
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646 Section 1 July 1, 2014 27-61a
4747
4848 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4949
5050 Section 1
5151
5252 July 1, 2014
5353
5454 27-61a
5555
56+Statement of Purpose:
5657
58+To update and increase the active service pay for members of the Connecticut National Guard.
5759
58-VA Joint Favorable C/R APP
59-
60-VA
61-
62-Joint Favorable C/R
63-
64-APP
60+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]