House | 04/18/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 431 | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | File Number 91 | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | House Calendar Number 69 | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |