House
|
06/13/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2014
|
Public Act 14-223
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 580
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5234
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
File Number 584
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
House Calendar Number 376
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|