House
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Special Act 14-15
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 459
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
File Number 346
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
House Calendar Number 208
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|