House | 04/15/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | File Number 296 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | House Calendar Number 176 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |