House | 06/06/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Public Act 14-142 | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 455 | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | File Number 585 | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Calendar Number 377 | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/17/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |