House | 05/12/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Public Act 14-17 | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 145 | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | File Number 46 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 43 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |