House
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-189
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 584
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5221
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
File Number 202
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
House Calendar Number 130
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|