House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | File Number 298 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | House Calendar Number 178 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/03/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/25/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |