House | 05/06/2014 | Matter Pass Retained | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Senate Reconsidered | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 472 | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | File Number 213 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | House Calendar Number 141 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 02/26/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |