House | 04/28/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 493 | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | File Number 588 | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Calendar Number 380 | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |