House | 06/03/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Public Act 14-79 | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 416 | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | File Number 405 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | House Calendar Number 240 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |