House
|
06/06/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Public Act 14-153
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
File Number 680
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 445
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3770
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
File Number 250
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
House Calendar Number 157
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|