House | 04/07/2014 | File Number 407 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | House Calendar Number 242 | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/03/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |