Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-163
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
File Number 733
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 4746
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4720
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
File Number 467
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
House Calendar Number 275
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|