House | 03/31/2014 | File Number 216 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | House Calendar Number 144 | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/17/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |