Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 549 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | File Number 530 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | House Calendar Number 337 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |