House | 03/11/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |