House
|
04/28/2014
|
File Number 693
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 508
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule C
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 4252
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 3663
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3664
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
File Number 217
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
House Calendar Number 145
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|