House
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-160
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
File Number 686
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 456
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4091
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
File Number 627
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
House Calendar Number 397
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2014
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|