House | 04/21/2014 | File Number 649 | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 428 | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3552 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | File Number 353 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/21/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |