House | 03/20/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2014 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |