House | 05/28/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Special Act 14-4 | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/02/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 462 | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | File Number 470 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | House Calendar Number 278 | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/04/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |