House
|
06/03/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Public Act 14-82
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
File Number 258
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
House Calendar Number 165
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|