House | 06/06/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/09/2014 | Special Act 14-9 | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 505 | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | File Number 443 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | House Calendar Number 259 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/04/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |