House | 05/06/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 582 | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/06/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | File Number 630 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | House Calendar Number 400 | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
House | 03/04/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |