House
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2014
|
Public Act 14-61
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
File Number 694
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 506
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4182
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
File Number 444
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
House Calendar Number 260
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|