House
|
06/11/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Public Act 14-162
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
File Number 714
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 516
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4464
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
File Number 674
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
File Number 355
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
House Calendar Number 217
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2014
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|