House | 06/11/2014 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Special Act 14-16 | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 457 | ||
House | 04/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | File Number 445 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | House Calendar Number 261 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2014 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |